NY S04654 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.580
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the New York city transit authority safety advisory panel to study and report on safety from terrorist acts and to provide a moratorium on the closing of token booths and minimum staffing levels on trains operated in passenger service in the NYC transit system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the New York city transit authority safety advisory panel to study and report on safety from terrorist acts and to provide a moratorium on the closing of token booths and minimum staffing levels on trains operated in passenger service in the NYC transit system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.580
2014-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.384
2014-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a2924a
2014-06-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2014-06-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-16SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1382
2014-06-16SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2014-06-03SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2013-11-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 4654A
2013-11-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2013-04-17SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A02924 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s4654a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback