NY S04648 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of Native American affairs to act as a centralized office for Native American nations to access information on state programs that are provided to Native Americans.
Title
Establishes the office of Native American affairs to act as a centralized office for Native American nations to access information on state programs that are provided to Native Americans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.77 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a2792 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.841 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02792 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - substituted by s4648