NY S04611 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nurse practitioners modernization act which allows the practice of registered professional nursing by a certified nurse practitioner to include diagnosis and performance without collaboration of a licensed physician.
Title
Establishes the nurse practitioners modernization act which allows the practice of registered professional nursing by a certified nurse practitioner to include diagnosis and performance without collaboration of a licensed physician.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4611B |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4611A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04846 (Same As) 2014-04-01 - enacting clause stricken