NY S04610 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to theft of services; includes the use of toll roads without payment of the lawful charge therefor.
Title
Relates to theft of services; includes the use of toll roads without payment of the lawful charge therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Fuschillo [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4610A |
2012-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.644 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.562 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07643 (Same As) 2012-05-18 - print number 7643a