NY A07643 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-18 - print number 7643a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-18 - print number 7643a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to theft of services; includes the intent to use toll roads without payment of the lawful charge therefor.
Title
Relates to theft of services; includes the intent to use toll roads without payment of the lawful charge therefor.
Sponsors
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Assembly | print number 7643a |
2012-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04610 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - referred to codes