NY S04591 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program related to making the gluten content of food available at certain state owned, operated, or leased cafeterias.
Title
Establishes a pilot program related to making the gluten content of food available at certain state owned, operated, or leased cafeterias.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.353 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06289 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken