NY S04580 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes bay constables appointed by a county, city, town or village within the definition of peace officers.
Title
Includes bay constables appointed by a county, city, town or village within the definition of peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.582 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.612 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06422 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - held for consideration in codes