NY S04562 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 4562A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 4562A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state power authority to issue requests for proposals on certain gas turbine generators installed in and around the New York metropolitan area.
Title
Directs the New York state power authority to issue requests for proposals on certain gas turbine generators installed in and around the New York metropolitan area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4562A |
2016-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.660 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02006 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - print number 2006a