NY S04559 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "school security guard training enhancement act"; provides requirements for a specialized certification for school security guards, including, but not limited to, retired police officers; requires topics including, but not limited to, the role and responsibility of school security officers, school-related laws and liability, security awareness in the educational environment, mediation/conflict resolution, disasters and emergencies and dynamics of student behavior be covered in such training and program; provides that such specialized certification and training program shall be implemented and enforced by the department of criminal justice services, in consultation with the division of homeland security and emergency services, state police and local law enforcement.
Title
Enacts the "school security guard training enhancement act"; provides requirements for a specialized certification for school security guards, including, but not limited to, retired police officers; requires topics including, but not limited to, the role and responsibility of school security officers, school-related laws and liability, security awareness in the educational environment, mediation/conflict resolution, disasters and emergencies and dynamics of student behavior be covered in such training and program; provides that such specialized certification and training program shall be implemented and enforced by the department of criminal justice services, in consultation with the division of homeland security and emergency services, state police and local law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4559B |
2023-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4559A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05903 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development