NY S04512 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a cyber security enhancement fund to be used for the purpose of upgrading cyber security in local governments, including but not limited to, villages, towns and cities with a population of one million or less; restricts the use of taxpayer moneys in paying ransoms in response to ransomware attacks.
Title
Creates a cyber security enhancement fund to be used for the purpose of upgrading cyber security in local governments, including but not limited to, villages, towns and cities with a population of one million or less; restricts the use of taxpayer moneys in paying ransoms in response to ransomware attacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.638 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04640 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations