NY S04487 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2660B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2660B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a personal income tax check-off box for donations to the school-based health centers fund; creates the school-based health centers fund; specifies the use for which moneys of the fund may be expended.
Title
Creates a personal income tax check-off box for donations to the school-based health centers fund; creates the school-based health centers fund; specifies the use for which moneys of the fund may be expended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2660B |
2018-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1640 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4487B |
2018-03-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4487A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02660 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.293