NY S04471 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - VETOED MEMO.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - VETOED MEMO.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires workers' compensation hearings and pre-hearing conferences to be stenographically recorded by a stenographer in the employ of the workers' compensation board.
Title
Requires workers' compensation hearings and pre-hearing conferences to be stenographically recorded by a stenographer in the employ of the workers' compensation board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.208 |
2013-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5235 |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.281 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05235 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - substituted by s4471