NY S04439 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sales and compensating use tax in Dutchess county.
Title
Relates to sales and compensating use tax in Dutchess county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5420 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.862 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05420 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - signed chap.313