NY S04425 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of certificates of insurance and requires the issuance of a certificate of insurance as a summary or evidence of property or casualty insurance.
Title
Relates to the issuance of certificates of insurance and requires the issuance of a certificate of insurance as a summary or evidence of property or casualty insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4425B |
2012-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.994 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4425A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2011-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06925 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - print number 6925a