NY S04375 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases certain penalties for aggravated cruelty to animals.
Title
Increases certain penalties for aggravated cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.754 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.372 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A00358 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to agriculture