NY S04353 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the parole supervision fee; relates to compensation paid to a prisoner for certain work; relates to incarceration fees; relates to probation administrative fees; prohibits certain fees associated with probation; provides for the termination and discharge of certain sentences.
Title
Relates to the parole supervision fee; relates to compensation paid to a prisoner for certain work; relates to incarceration fees; relates to probation administrative fees; prohibits certain fees associated with probation; provides for the termination and discharge of certain sentences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4353A |
2021-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05433 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - referred to correction