NY S04346 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a credentialing pilot program for direct support professionals to assist and enhance the field of direct care support.
Title
Relates to establishing a credentialing pilot program for direct support professionals to assist and enhance the field of direct care support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-03-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00080 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means