NY S04339 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing rent subsidies to individuals living with roommates.
Title
Relates to providing rent subsidies to individuals living with roommates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.624 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1008 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4339 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-03-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.136 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-01 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4258 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1008 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A04258 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.624