NY S04338 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that certain documents attached to real estate tax returns are not considered tax returns for certain secrecy purposes.
Title
Clarifies that certain documents attached to real estate tax returns are not considered tax returns for certain secrecy purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4338B |
2021-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4338A |
2021-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05405 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means