NY S04336 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process for neutral arbitrators to review certain disciplinary decisions and penalties imposed on members of the New York city police department.
Title
Establishes a process for neutral arbitrators to review certain disciplinary decisions and penalties imposed on members of the New York city police department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-06-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4336A |
2023-06-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-04-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |