NY S04332 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4332B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4332B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires registration of new automotive broker businesses; enacts various provisions relating to conduct of such businesses; defines certain deceptive practices; establishes rights of action and penalties.
Title
Requires registration of new automotive broker businesses; enacts various provisions relating to conduct of such businesses; defines certain deceptive practices; establishes rights of action and penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4332B |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4332A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01932 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - amended on third reading 1932c