NY S04331 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a human trafficking hotline for use in the investigation and prevention of human trafficking.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a human trafficking hotline for use in the investigation and prevention of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.589 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4331A |
2016-04-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02636 (Same As) 2016-04-05 - amended on third reading 2636b