NY A02636 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - amended on third reading 2636b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - amended on third reading 2636b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a human trafficking hotline for use in the investigation and prevention of human trafficking.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a human trafficking hotline for use in the investigation and prevention of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2636b |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.120 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.102 |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | print number 2636a |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04331 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES