NY S04326 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the private employers veterans' preference policy act.
Title
Relates to establishing the private employers veterans' preference policy act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.63 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06947 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to veterans' affairs