NY S04326 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - DEFEATED IN TRANSPORTATION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - DEFEATED IN TRANSPORTATION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of rear wheel guards on certain vehicles.
Title
Requires the use of rear wheel guards on certain vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | DEFEATED IN TRANSPORTATION |
2014-02-24 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06418 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation