NY S04323 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.137
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.137
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a construction industry advisory council on public contracting reform to consider and advise on matters concerning the improvement of the current public works contracting process.
Title
Establishes a construction industry advisory council on public contracting reform to consider and advise on matters concerning the improvement of the current public works contracting process.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.137 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.782 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.663 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6232c |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4323C |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1539 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4323B |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4323A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A06232 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4323c