NY S04306 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "Make Voting Easy Act"; requires the board of elections to designate a number of early voting polling places based on the number of registered voters in each county; relates to the hours polls are open for early voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "Make Voting Easy Act"; requires the board of elections to designate a number of early voting polling places based on the number of registered voters in each county; relates to the hours polls are open for early voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.709
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a5424a
2021-06-10Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1684
2021-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-06-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 4306B
2021-06-07SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2021-05-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 4306A
2021-05-07SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2021-02-03SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05424 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4306b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4306
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04306&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04306
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04306&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04306A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04306&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04306B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4306#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04306&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4306#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback