NY A05424 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4306b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4306b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Make Voting Easy Act"; requires the board of elections to designate a number of early voting polling places based on the number of registered voters in each county; relates to the hours polls are open for early voting.
Title
Enacts the "Make Voting Easy Act"; requires the board of elections to designate a number of early voting polling places based on the number of registered voters in each county; relates to the hours polls are open for early voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4306b |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.709 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.709 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | print number 5424a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04306 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.781