NY S04302 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7632
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7632
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allegations in family offense petitions.
Title
Relates to allegations in family offense petitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7632 |
2011-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.914 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4302A |
2011-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2011-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07632 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - signed chap.309