NY S04300 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Title
Relates to the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.43 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.129 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6245a |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.612 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06245 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - substituted by s4300