NY S04278 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "women on corporate boards study"; requires the department of state, in collaboration with the department of taxation and finance, to conduct a study on the number of women directors who serve on each board of directors of domestic corporations and foreign corporations authorized to do business in New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "women on corporate boards study"; requires the department of state, in collaboration with the department of taxation and finance, to conduct a study on the number of women directors who serve on each board of directors of domestic corporations and foreign corporations authorized to do business in New York state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-30AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.93
2019-12-30AssemblySIGNED CHAP.747
2019-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading cal.424
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6330
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.778
2019-03-06SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06330 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4278

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback