NY S04276 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of local cost data when adjusting claims; requires an insurer and independent adjuster to adjust certain claims made under an insurance policy that provides coverage for loss of or damage to property using cost data appropriate for the region of this state where the loss or damage occurred.
Title
Relates to the use of local cost data when adjusting claims; requires an insurer and independent adjuster to adjust certain claims made under an insurance policy that provides coverage for loss of or damage to property using cost data appropriate for the region of this state where the loss or damage occurred.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5015 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1458 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05015 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - tabled