NY S04271 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 4271A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 4271A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Timothy Colling, a town of Hamburg police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Timothy Colling, a town of Hamburg police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4271A |
2022-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1538 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |