NY S04271 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants personal income taxpayers the ability to make a gift to the state parks on their tax returns; establishes the state parks fund to provide monies to the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation for the operation and maintenance of the state parks.
Title
Grants personal income taxpayers the ability to make a gift to the state parks on their tax returns; establishes the state parks fund to provide monies to the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation for the operation and maintenance of the state parks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4271A |
2012-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |