NY S04261 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 4261A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 4261A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a peer support program for veterans.
Title
Establishes a peer support program for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4261A |
2020-02-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A02945 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - print number 2945a