NY S04249 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the power of the public employment relations board to investigate unfair labor practices.
Title
Relates to the power of the public employment relations board to investigate unfair labor practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.148 |
2013-07-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7664 |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.735 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07664 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - substituted by s4249