NY S04245 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the terms electronic prescription and electronic signature and enacts provisions for their use.
Title
Defines the terms electronic prescription and electronic signature and enacts provisions for their use.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3334 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.594 |
2011-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03334 (Same As) 2011-10-14 - signed chap.590