NY S04211 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of pregnancy-related condition to include lactation as a possible way of determining if an individual possesses such condition.
Title
Amends the definition of pregnancy-related condition to include lactation as a possible way of determining if an individual possesses such condition.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.271 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.246 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4211 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.32 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | rules report cal.32 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-22 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5975 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.246 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A05975 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.271