NY S04198 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4198A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4198A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Clinton county's authorization to impose an additional 1% rate of sales and compensating use tax through November 30, 2022.
Title
Extends Clinton county's authorization to impose an additional 1% rate of sales and compensating use tax through November 30, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4198A |
2020-02-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01639 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - print number 1639b