NY S04193 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state department of health to conduct a study on the incidences of cancer clusters in cities and towns having a population of more than ninety thousand.
Title
Directs the New York state department of health to conduct a study on the incidences of cancer clusters in cities and towns having a population of more than ninety thousand.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4219 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1345 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04219 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - tabled