NY S04180 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for temporary suspension of sales and compensating use tax on certain services, during governor ordered state of emergency, provided by contractors, subcontractors, repairpersons or property owners for clean-up activities associated with real property, property or land after a natural or manmade disaster.
Title
Provides for temporary suspension of sales and compensating use tax on certain services, during governor ordered state of emergency, provided by contractors, subcontractors, repairpersons or property owners for clean-up activities associated with real property, property or land after a natural or manmade disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4180A |
2012-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |