NY S04173 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of education of the city of New York to provide information to the public relating to inspections of school kitchens and cafeterias.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of education of the city of New York to provide information to the public relating to inspections of school kitchens and cafeterias.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.313
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.446
2017-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7684
2017-05-24Assemblyreferred to education
2017-05-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-01SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4173A
2017-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.396
2017-02-06SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A07684 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s4173a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback