NY S04169 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the water bill fairness act; authorizes local water and sewerage authorities to charge fees for surface runoff.
Title
Enacts the water bill fairness act; authorizes local water and sewerage authorities to charge fees for surface runoff.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Kristen Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2023-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04019 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - enacting clause stricken