NY S04165 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the publication of information regarding waivers of compliance with state contract provisions concerning minority-owned and women-owned business enterprise participation requirements.
Title
Relates to the publication of information regarding waivers of compliance with state contract provisions concerning minority-owned and women-owned business enterprise participation requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.348 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.398 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7689 |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.530 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4165A |
2021-03-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A07689 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s4165a