NY S04165 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the filling of borrow pits in Jamaica Bay.
Title
Relates to the filling of borrow pits in Jamaica Bay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.248 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.819 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4165A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.137 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.137 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Senate | print number 5767a |
2019-06-03 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5767A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4165A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.819 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05767 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled