NY S04130 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a free association library in Port Chester.
Title
Relates to a free association library in Port Chester.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5641 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.327 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05641 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - signed chap.254