NY S04110 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - signed chap.35
Status: Introduced on April 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - signed chap.35
Summary
Relates to voluntary separations from work for compelling family reasons and to extended benefits; includes additional criteria for providing benefits in the case of voluntary separation; and provides extended benefits for certain periods.
Title
Relates to voluntary separations from work for compelling family reasons and to extended benefits; includes additional criteria for providing benefits in the case of voluntary separation; and provides extended benefits for certain periods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8273 | |
2009-05-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-13 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-12 | 1ST REPORT CAL.297 | |
2009-05-11 | PRINT NUMBER 4110A | |
2009-05-11 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-20 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-13 | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08273 (Same As) 2009-05-20 - signed chap.35
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04110&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |