NY S04094 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the continuity of care to persons with developmental disabilities upon diminution of state operated services to such persons.
Title
Provides for the continuity of care to persons with developmental disabilities upon diminution of state operated services to such persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7332 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1814 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07332 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - tabled