NY S04086 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes gifts, on personal income tax returns, for substance use disorder education and recovery; establishes the substance use disorder education and recovery fund for the receipt and expenditure of monies from such gifts; directs the office of addiction services and supports to provide grants to organizations engaged in activities dedicated to providing education, prevention, treatment or recovery to those suffering from substance use disorders.
Title
Authorizes gifts, on personal income tax returns, for substance use disorder education and recovery; establishes the substance use disorder education and recovery fund for the receipt and expenditure of monies from such gifts; directs the office of addiction services and supports to provide grants to organizations engaged in activities dedicated to providing education, prevention, treatment or recovery to those suffering from substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.572 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.585 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6553 |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.519 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A06553 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4086