NY S04082 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exception to high school athletic competition eligibility by permitting pupils with a developmental or physical disability to compete for a fifth year.
Title
Provides an exception to high school athletic competition eligibility by permitting pupils with a developmental or physical disability to compete for a fifth year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1456 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10081 (Same As) 2012-05-03 - referred to education